skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 8:54:16 AM

Joshi, Vishal

CPSO#: 97481

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ajax Pickering Hospital
Lakeridge Health
Department of Infectious Diseases
580 Harwood Ave S.
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge and Scarborough Hospital
Dept of Medicine/Infectious Disease
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vishal Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Joshi ( CPSO# 97481 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Rouge Valley Ajax & Pickering
Department of Infectious Diseases
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Pickering ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Rouge Valley Centenary
Department of Infectious Diseases
2867 Ellesmere Street
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:03 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013 Active
 Dr.  Vishal  Joshi may practice medicine independently in internal medicine and
            infectious diseases, only.