THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:46:16 AM
Joshi, Vishal
CPSO#:
97481
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ajax Pickering Hospital
Lakeridge Health
Department of Infectious Diseases
580 Harwood Ave S.
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:03 May 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 Oct 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
|
Active |