skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 3:56:07 AM

Long, Bradley Forrest

CPSO#: 97420

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7147 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

450 Notre Dame Ave, #10
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K8
Canada
Phone: 7056731116
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Forrest Long Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 7 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Feb 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2014 Active
                   Dr.  Bradley  Forrest  Long may practise medicine independently in family
                  medicine, only.