THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:35:02 PM
Long, Bradley Forrest
CPSO#:
97420
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7147
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Forrest Long Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 7 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Espanola General Hospital |
Espanola |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Feb 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2014 |
|
Active |