skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/10/21 7:53:51 AM

Sood, Divya

CPSO#: 96981

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1585 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W1
Phone: (416) 299-6063 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2934 Eglinton Ave. E
Scarborough ON  M1J 2E4
Canada
Phone: 4166678488
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D Sood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sood ( CPSO# 96981 )

Business Address:
2934 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1J 2E4
Phone Number: (416) 667-8488

Business Address:
108 - 1585 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 299-6064

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DIVYA SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 07 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Dec 2012 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2014 to 19 Mar 2014
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2015