THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:01:52 AM
Sood, Divya
CPSO#:
96981
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
108-1585 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 2W1
Phone: 4162996064
Fax: 4162991421
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIVYA SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 07 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 08 Dec 2012 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2014 to 19 Mar 2014
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2015 |