THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:16:43 PM
Sharma, Niti
CPSO#:
96743
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Indira Gandhi Medical College, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: 705-734-6284
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Nov 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |
|
Active |