skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 2:52:43 AM

Dibildox Gonzalez, Manuel

CPSO#: 96280

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Manuel Dibildox Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dibildox Gonzalez ( CPSO# 96280 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 8N
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2C4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective:13 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Manuel Dibildox Gonzalez may:

                     (i)    practice medicine independently in general surgery and critical
            care medicine, only;

                    AND

                   (ii)    practice  plastic  surgery  with the Windsor Regional Hospital -
            Ouellette  Campus  and                        Windsor   Regional   Hospital   -
            Metropolitan      Campus      in      Windsor,      Ontario     while     under
            supervision coordinated by a supervisor accepteble to the College.

            2.    The authority to practice in clause 1(ii) automatically  expires upon the
            following events,                 unless the Registration Committee  renews the
            certificate with or without additional or other           terms, conditions and
            limitations:

                     (i)     the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding
            Dr. Dibildox Gonzalez's      knowledge,  skill, judgement or attitude, does not
            provide the required reports to the                         College  by the due
            date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

                    (ii)      the  supervisor  is no longer able or willing to continue  to
            supervise Dr. Dibildox                              Gonzalez's practice.