THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:18:56 AM
Dibildox Gonzalez, Manuel
CPSO#:
96280
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Nov 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Manuel Dibildox Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2021 |