skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 16:50:57 PM

Abdulrehman, Jameel

CPSO#: 95789

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3111 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: ABDULREHMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abdulrehman ( CPSO# 95789 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMEEL ABDULREHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULREHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
EL - Transfusion Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2016