THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 3:21:25 AM
Abdulrehman, Jameel
CPSO#:
95789
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: 416-340-3799
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:04 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMEEL ABDULREHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULREHMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
EL - Transfusion Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2016 |