skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 6:44:46 AM

Wlodarski, Martin Jozef

CPSO#: 95712

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
17 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CDK Family Medicine & Walk-In Clinic 175 Princess Street Kingston ON K7L 1A9 OR Queen's Family Health Team 220 Bagot Street Kingston ON K7L 5E9
Instructions: Please contact Hospital or Clinic where patient was seen.
Date Received: 31 May 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2021