THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 23:35:10 PM
Wlodarski, Martin Jozef
CPSO#:
95712
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Hospital or Clinic where patient was seen.
CDK Family Medicine & Walk-In Clinic
175 Princess Street
Kingston ON K7L 1A9
OR
Queen's Family Health Team
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON K7L 5E9
Date Received: 31 May 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2021 |