skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/12/21 10:00:47 AM

Taghavi, Reza

CPSO#: 95213

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B20
217 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 304-6433
Fax: (519) 757-0070 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Reza Taghavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taghavi ( CPSO# 95213 )

Business Address:
B20
217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone Number: (519) 304-6433


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iran

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REZA TAGHAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGHAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015