THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:05:41 PM
Taghavi, Reza
CPSO#:
95213
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Islamic Azad University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit B20
217 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 304-6433
Fax: (519) 757-0070
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Aug 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:24 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REZA TAGHAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGHAVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |