skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/08/21 7:22:26 AM

Bhavsar, Sankalp Virendrakumar

CPSO#: 94881

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
672 Brant Sreet
Suite 407
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone: (905) 632-0607
Fax: (905) 632-8810 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sankalp V. Bhavsar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhavsar ( CPSO# 94881 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone Number: (905) 632-0607

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANKALP VIRENDRAKUMAR BHAVSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAVSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 14 Mar 2011 to 10 Apr 2011
EL - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
EL - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2014