THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:46:28 AM
Bhavsar, Sankalp Virendrakumar
CPSO#:
94881
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Marathi
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
672 Brant Sreet
Suite 407
Burlington ON L7R 2H3
Phone: (905) 632-0607
Fax: (905) 632-8810
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:29 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANKALP VIRENDRAKUMAR BHAVSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAVSAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Mar 2011 to 10 Apr 2011
EL - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
EL - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2014 |