skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 7:08:40 AM

Gupta, Ankur

CPSO#: 94144

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2010 to 03 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jan 2020
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 18 Aug 2020
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2020