THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:03:43 AM
Gupta, Ankur
CPSO#:
94144
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
18 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Maharshi Dayanand University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2010 to 03 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jan 2020
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 18 Aug 2020
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2020 |