skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 0:39:21 AM

Anawati, Alexandre Georges

CPSO#: 93916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1C5
Canada
Phone: 705-673-3721
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Anawati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Anawati ( CPSO# 93916 )

Business Address:
344 Elgin Street
2nd Floor
Sudbury ON  P3E 3N9
Phone Number: (705) 673-3721

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRE GEORGES ANAWATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAWATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 05 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
EL - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
EL - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011