THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:41:43 PM
Anawati, Alexandre Georges
CPSO#:
93916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Emergency Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRE GEORGES ANAWATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAWATI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 05 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
EL - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
EL - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |