skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 7:49:37 AM

Ziada, Ahmed Mahmoud Ali

CPSO#: 93181

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120 Wellington St.
St Thomas ON  N5R 2R4
Phone: (519) 633-9200 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ahmed Ziada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ziada ( CPSO# 93181 )

Business Address:
120 Wellington Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 2R4
Phone Number: (519) 633-9200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED MAHMOUD ALI ZIADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 09 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

Western University, 31 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

Western University, 27 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014