THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:41:35 AM
Ziada, Ahmed Mahmoud Ali
CPSO#:
93181
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
120 Wellington St.
St Thomas ON N5R 2R4
Phone: (519) 633-9200
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMED MAHMOUD ALI ZIADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIADA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2014 |