skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 4:38:33 AM

Rusalovs'ka, Svitlana Vitaliyivna

CPSO#: 92614

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Zaporozhye State Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 224
329 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 2E1
Phone: (613) 592-1001
Fax: 1-343-308-0305 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rusalovs'ka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rusalovs'ka ( CPSO# 92614 )

Business Address:
Suite 224
329 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 2E1
Phone Number: (613) 592-1001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:02 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SVITLANA VITALIYIVNA RUSALOVS'KA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSALOVS'KA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2010 to 31 May 2010
EL - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012