THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:23:05 PM
Rusalovs'ka, Svitlana Vitaliyivna
CPSO#:
92614
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Zaporozhye State Medical University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Kayenta St
Stittsville ON K2S 2K7
Phone: 13439991888
Fax: 13433080305
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SVITLANA VITALIYIVNA RUSALOVS'KA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSALOVS'KA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2010 to 31 May 2010
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2012 |