skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 11:29:45 AM

Al Haddad, Wael Jamil Thiab

CPSO#: 91470

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Trauma General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Trauma General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015