THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:43:50 PM
Al Haddad, Wael Jamil Thiab
CPSO#:
91470
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Jordan, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Trauma General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |