skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/05/22 8:06:07 AM

Wali, Dilip

CPSO#: 91349

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education: University of Calcutta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway West
Suite 110
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dilip Wali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 5 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 29 Mar 2021 Active
 
                  
Dr.  Dilip  Wali may practise medicine independently in internal  medicine, only.
         


Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: June 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective July 19, 2019, Dr. Dilip Wali has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)