THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:16:43 PM
Wali, Dilip
CPSO#:
91349
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Calcutta, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway West
Suite 110
Mississauga ON L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 01 May 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 29 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: June 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective July 19, 2019, Dr. Dilip Wali has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)