skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 16:38:27 PM

Abo Aisha, Sanaa Mohamed Ibrahim Seleem

CPSO#: 91205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2055 Huron Church Road, Suite 130
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Phone: (519) 915-1207
Fax: (519) 915-1664 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Abo Aisha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abo Aisha ( CPSO# 91205 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
130-2055 Huron Church
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Phone Number: (519) 915-1207

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:21 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANAA MOHAMED IBRAHIM SELEEM ABO AISHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABO AISHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2013