THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:20:47 PM
Abo Aisha, Sanaa Mohamed Ibrahim Seleem
CPSO#:
91205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
suite 210-2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor ON N9C 2L6
Phone: 5199151207 Ext. 1
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:21 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANAA MOHAMED IBRAHIM SELEEM ABO AISHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABO AISHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2013 |