skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/11/21 12:54:19 PM

Jaff, Zardasht Hasan

CPSO#: 90885

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Gaf, Zardasht Hasan (used until: 28 Apr 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kurdi

Education:Hawler Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3225 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Z Jaff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jaff ( CPSO# 90885 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZARDASHT HASAN JAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 05 Apr 2011 to 10 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jul 2011 to 10 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 11 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014