THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:09:25 AM
Jaff, Zardasht Hasan
CPSO#:
90885
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Gaf, Zardasht Hasan (used until: 28 Apr 2010 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Kurdi
Education: Hawler Medical University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3225
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZARDASHT HASAN JAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 05 Apr 2011 to 10 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Jul 2011 to 10 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |