skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 7:48:50 AM

Zaki, Salma

CPSO#: 90459

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
54 B, HOLLAND STREET WEST
P.O. Box 1487
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B8
Phone: 905-551-7666
Fax: 905-551-4666 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

16880 Yonge Street
Unit # 1
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Canada
Phone: 905-895-9777
Fax: 905-895-9720
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S Zaki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zaki ( CPSO# 90459 )

Business Address:
Suite B
54 Holland Street West
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B8

Business Address:
16880 Yonge Street
Suite 1
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 895-9777

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking access to their medical records can contact: Centrum Services Inc. Unit 4, 200 Davis Drive, Newmarket, ON, L3Y 2N1, Tel: 905-853-8525. Fax: 905-853-8530
Date Received: 28 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SALMA ZAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 29 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2012