THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:35:12 PM
Zaki, Salma
CPSO#:
90459
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
54B Holland Street West
Bradford ON L3Z 2B8
Phone: 905-551-7666
Fax: 905-551-4666
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to their medical records from Oct.2011 to Apr.2019 (Centrum Aurora office) can contact: Centrum Services Inc. Unit 4, 200 Davis Drive, Newmarket, ON, L3Y 2N1, Tel: 905-853-8525. Fax: 905-853-8530
Date Received: 17 May 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALMA ZAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2012 |