THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/03/23 18:39:14 PM
Bax, Kevin Charles
CPSO#:
90226
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Indiana University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
PO Box 5010, Room B1-164
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8177
Fax: (519) 685-8105
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:04 Feb 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:24 Jan 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2019 |
|
Active |