skip to content

Bax, Kevin Charles

CPSO#: 90226

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
PO Box 5010, Room B1-164
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8177
Fax: (519) 685-8105 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bax Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bax ( CPSO# 90226 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B1-164
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:04 Feb 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:24 Jan 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2019 Active
 Dr.  Kevin  Charles  Bax  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  pediatric
            gastroenterology. 


Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.