skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 11:22:22 AM

Iyer, Hariharan Subramaniam

CPSO#: 89266

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Pramukhswami Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room A10 - 207
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 6858500 Ext. 33852
Fax: (519) 663-3449 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Iyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Iyer ( CPSO# 89266 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective:16 May 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2008
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2019 Active
             Dr.   Hariharan   Subramaniam  Iyer  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            nephrology.