THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:04:34 AM
Iyer, Hariharan Subramaniam
CPSO#:
89266
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Pramukhswami Medical College, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room A10 - 207
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 6858500 Ext. 33852
Fax: (519) 663-3449
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nephrology |
Effective:16 May 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2008
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2019 |
|
Active |