skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 15:21:47 PM

Bruinsma, David Ryan

CPSO#: 89051

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905 522-1155 Ext. 38510 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bruinsma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bruinsma ( CPSO# 89051 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:24 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID RYAN BRUINSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUINSMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010