THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:26:45 AM
Bruinsma, David Ryan
CPSO#:
89051
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905 522-1155 Ext. 38510
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bruinsma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services |
Owen Sound |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:24 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID RYAN BRUINSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUINSMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |