THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
21/09/23 5:38:11 AM
Chittle, Andrea Diane
CPSO#:
88446
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
130 Colonnade Road
Public Health Agency of Canada
Ottawa ON K1A 0K9
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA DIANE CHITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHITTLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2011 |