skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/08/21 7:02:14 AM

Mankoo, Ravinder Singh

CPSO#: 87886

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Grace University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800-790 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: 4168378181
Fax: 6474274928 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

764 Baker Crescent
Unit B
Kingston ON  K7M 6P6
Canada
Phone: 613-389-4400
Fax: 613-389-4450
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

106 Humber College Blvd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9V4E4
Canada
Phone: 416-742-0680
Fax: 416-742-0681
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

34-480 Chrysler Dr
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Canada
Phone: 1-888-281-1794
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.S.Mankoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mankoo ( CPSO# 87886 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
International Sleep Clinic
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Business Address:
Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 837-8181


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAVINDER SINGH MANKOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANKOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 18 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 19 Feb 2010 to 19 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2012 to 19 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 02 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014