THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:49:54 AM
Mankoo, Ravinder Singh
CPSO#:
87886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Grace University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: 4168378181
Fax: 6474274928
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAVINDER SINGH MANKOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANKOO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 18 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 19 Feb 2010 to 19 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2012 to 19 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |