skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 1:50:51 AM

McMillan, John Kenneth

CPSO#: 86985

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
Sir William Osler Health Institute
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 201
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone: (905) 574-5444
Fax: (905) 574-1119 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Musicians' Clinics of Canada
340 College Street
Suite 340
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2011