THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 20:18:58 PM
McMillan, John Kenneth
CPSO#:
86985
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
Sir William Osler Health Institute
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 201
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Phone: (905) 574-5444
Fax: (905) 574-1119
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH MCMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMILLAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2011 |