skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/07/21 16:41:21 PM

Jacob, Thomas Kallarackel

CPSO#: 86091

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Apr 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. John's Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GC 430
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787-2071

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Nov 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:16 Nov 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:11 Nov 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THOMAS KALLARACKEL JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2007