THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:14:02 AM
Jacob, Thomas Kallarackel
CPSO#:
86091
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Apr 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. John's Medical College, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
GC 430
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787-2071
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:16 Nov 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:11 Nov 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS KALLARACKEL JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2007 |