skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/08/21 6:58:25 AM

Krishna, Dinesh Ram

CPSO#: 86006

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Foundation Physiotherapy
383 Front St West
Toronto ON  M5V 3S8
Canada
Phone: 6473505800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr.Dinesh Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krishna ( CPSO# 86006 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital ED
4001 Leslie Avenue
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DINESH RAM KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 12 Mar 2007 to 15 Apr 2007
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2013