THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:06:00 AM
Krishna, Dinesh Ram
CPSO#:
86006
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:22 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DINESH RAM KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2007 to 15 Apr 2007
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2013 |